judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NATIONAL TITLE CO. VS. J. COBLENTZ 1994 TRUST

Case Information: 36342
Short Caption:NATIONAL TITLE CO. VS. J. COBLENTZ 1994 TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A394683Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/06/2000 / Goldberg, AubreySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/13/2002 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:05/13/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David Goldwater, Esq.--check no. 2106.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10827
06/26/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
07/06/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Aubrey Goldberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 00-12333
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel firm-check no. 112863.
07/21/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter.
08/28/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-15108
08/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statements mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
09/06/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellants/Cross-Respondents. 00-15653
09/11/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statements, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent and respondents/cross-appellants: 15 days each to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant/cross-respondent: 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-15930
09/11/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Not typewritten). Docketing statement to counsel for Respondent/Cross-Appellant.
09/18/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-16406
10/10/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 02/24/00 and 03/09/00 Court Reporters: Kimberly D. McAndrews and Roger D. Calabrese. 00-17871
11/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants and cross-appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal and cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal and cross-appeal will be suspended pending further order of this court. 00-20796
12/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Barney C. Ales of the law firm of Goold Patterson DeVore Ales & Roadhouse as counsel for respondent/cross-appellant National Title Company, in place and stead of David Goldwater, who recently passed away. 00-22063
12/18/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Order to Show Cause. (with attached stipulation.) 00-22064
12/21/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The joint motion filed December 18, 2000, is granted. The parties' responses to the order to show cause entered on November 28, 2000, shall be served and filed on or before January 18, 2001. 00-22260
01/12/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. (Appellants/Cross-Respondents) 01-00738
01/18/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. National Title Company's Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-01114
03/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. Order Reinstating Briefing and Dismissing in Part Cross-Appeal. We dismiss the cross-appeal insofar as it concerns the denial of Coblentz's motion to alter or amend the judgment. But we reinstate briefing as to the appeal and the remainder of the cross-appeal. Coblentz shall have 60 days from the dte of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-04583
04/10/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation for Re-Designation of Parties. 01-06147
04/10/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 13, 2001. 01-06150
04/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellants/cross-respondents and respondent/cross-appellant, have failed to file either a transcript request forms or certificates indicating that no transcripts are being requested. The parties shall each file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested within 10 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel. 01-06625
04/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption to be consistent with the caption on this order. We remind appellant/cross-respondent National Title Company that pursuant to stipulation of the parties filed April 10, 2001, the opening brief and appendix are due to be filed by June 13, 2001. 01-07004
04/27/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order filed April 18, 2001. 01-07091
04/30/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Re: Transcripts (Removed Exhibits B & C and filed separately - see next docket entry). 01-07209
04/30/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: February 24, 2000 and March 9, 2000. Court Reporters: Kimberly D. McAndrews and Roger D. Calabrese (originally attached to response to order as exhibits B and C- see previous docket entry). 01-07213
06/11/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-09681
06/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed June 11, 2001. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have to and including July 13, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We caution counsel that failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional requests for extension of time may result in the denial of the motion. 01-09813
07/16/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Opening Brief of Appellant/Cross-Respondent National Title Company. Mailed on: Fed Ex 07/14/01. 01-11946
07/16/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix. 01-11947
07/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 27, 2001, and April 30, 2001, respectively, respondents/cross-appellants and appellant/cross-respondent filed responses to our April 18, 2001, order. fn1[We note that although the parties filed responses, they did not file the required documents as directed in our order. We caution counsel for the parties that future failure to comply with the orders of this court may result in the imposition of sanctions. Nevertheless, in the interests of judicial efficiency, we elect to waive the requirements of NRAP 9(a) and we vacate our April 18, 2001, order directing the parties to comply with NRAP 9(a). 01-12747
08/10/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 14, 2001. 01-13619
09/17/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 09/14/01./Respondents/Cross-Appellants The J. Coblentz 1994 Trust Dated 12/15/94; The Winthrop Trust Dated 8/9/92; and Suzanne Coblentz Feld Answering Brief on Appea; amd Opening Brief on Cross Appeal. 01-15618
09/17/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Appendix to Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal. 01-15619
10/12/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 14, 2001. 01-17229
11/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second request) 01-18762
11/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 9, 2001. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until December 4, 2001, to file and serve the combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. 01-19239
12/10/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-20681
12/12/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed December 11, 2001. The clerk shall file the combined brief received on December 10, 2001. Respondents/cross-appellants shall, if deemed necessary, file and serve a reply brief on cross appeal within 30 days from the date of this order. 01-20874
12/12/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Reply Brief of Appellant/Cross-Respondent National Title Company and Answering Brief to Cross Appeal Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/07/01. 01-20682
01/07/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Mailed on: 01/04/02. 02-00419
04/02/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on May 13, 2002, at 9:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP02M-WM/DA/ML)
04/29/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
05/13/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. Argued by: Barney C. Ales, as counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and Samuel S. Lionel, as counsel for respondents/cross-appellants. SNP02-WM/DA/ML
08/20/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART. We remand to the district court to enter judgment based upon a $200,000 verdict." SNP02M-Maupin, C.J. and Agosti, J. Leavitt, J., dissenting. 02-14229
09/10/2002Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/10/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: September 9, 2002. 02-15651
09/11/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Goold firm - check no. 53905.
10/22/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Maupin, C.J. And Agosti. Leavitt, J., dissenting. SNP02M-WM/DA/ML 02-18319
11/04/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on: November 1, 2002. 02-18966
11/19/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-18824
11/19/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/18/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[The Honorable Cliff Young, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC-Maupin, V.C.J., Shearing, Agosti, and Rose, JJ. Leavitt, J., and Becker, J., dissenting. 02-21601
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 21, 2002. 02-18824
02/07/2003RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Original Transcipt of Proceedings this day. 02-18824
02/14/2003RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on February 7, 2003. 02-18824