judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANTHONY SMITH v. LEWIS AUTO BODY

Case Heading (S-10-0267)
Case Number:S-10-0267Case Docketed On:12/29/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:ANTHONY SMITH v. LEWIS AUTO BODY
Full Title:ANTHONY SMITH, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. LEWIS AUTO BODY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAnthony SmithJulie Nye Tiedeken
Brian John Hunter
William Mather McKellar
AppelleeLewis Auto BodyMitchell E. Osborn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Liens, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2011 WY 109
Citation:255 P.3d 935

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/29/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/29/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/11/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant, Anthony Smith; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/31/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/11/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/13/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of Appellant, Anthony SmithEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/25/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volumes IV-V, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/25/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/13/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/29/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal