judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONROE (DWIGHT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33512
Short Caption:MONROE (DWIGHT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982184Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/24/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/24/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00504
01/07/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. November 11, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr. 99-00089
01/20/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00385
01/20/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-00386
02/03/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-00761
02/03/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 99-00763
03/11/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-01725
04/06/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-02558
04/06/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/14/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on april 9, 1999. 99-02558