judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EXCEL CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. TOWN OF LOVELL, WYOMING, an incorporated municipality

Case Heading (S-11-0001)
Case Number:S-11-0001Case Docketed On:01/03/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:EXCEL CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. TOWN OF LOVELL, WYOMING, an incorporated municipality
Full Title:EXCEL CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TOWN OF LOVELL, WYOMING, an incorporated municipality, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantExcel Construction, Inc., a Wyoming corporationPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeTown of Lovell, WyomingTracy J. Copenhaver
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverTravelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, a Connecticut corporationBradley D. Bonner

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2011 WY 166
Citation:268 P.3d 238

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/03/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/22/2011Brief - Appellant - out of state counsel on cover page not admitted pro hac vice.BriefAppellantFinal
02/23/2011Event - Phone Call from counsel for Appellant re pro hac vice admission, explained does not carry through from District Court, will file motion in this CourtEventPhone CallFinal
02/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief. Sent in two packages, only one received in today's mailEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Remaining copies of Appellant's Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/05/2011Brief - Appellee (out-of-state counsel listed on cover and service list are not admitted pro hac vice and will be served by conventional means).BriefAppelleeFinal
04/05/2011Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel for appellant regarding out of state counsel. They will not be admitted pro hac vice for this case, and should not be shown as participating counsel on any further filings.EventPhone CallFinal
04/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tracy Copenhaver for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick J. Murphy for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/25/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2011Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from district court clerk indicating that counsel for appellee did not file a designation of record.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/02/2011Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
05/05/2011Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
05/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/06/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Original Papers and Exhibits to Depositions; Volume V, Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/24/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick J. Murphy for appellant; Tracy J. Copenhaver for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/24/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/20/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/06/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/06/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/06/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/10/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/9/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal