judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-1233
B-1233
11/26/1968
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES H. BUTLER
L. H. (BUD) HANSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/23/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
11/26/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/02/1970Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
06/10/1970Dissenting opinion issued.
06/10/1970Opinion issued
06/04/1969Document received (See Remarks)
12/23/1968Response to Petition
11/26/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/26/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L. H. (Bud) HansonRespondent
James H. ButlerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information