judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PHILIP A. WOLF v. THOMAS S. PETERS

Case Heading (S-11-0018)
Case Number:S-11-0018Case Docketed On:01/24/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:PHILIP A. WOLF v. THOMAS S. PETERS
Full Title:PHILIP A. WOLF, Appellant (Respondent), v. THOMAS S. PETERS, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPhilip A. Wolf Pro Se
AppelleeThomas S. PetersKatherine Drewry Peters

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/24/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
01/24/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/07/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
02/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion to DismissEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2011Response/Objection - Other - Motion to Dismiss (Fax Filed)Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
02/28/2011Response/Objection - Other - Motion to Dismiss (Original) - did not submit 6 additional copies as required)Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
03/01/2011Order - Granting, In Part, Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Sent notice to Appellant that original and six copies of brief will be required and directed him to Wyo. R. App. P. online.OrderGrantFinal
03/14/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/29/2011Order - Other - Summary AffirmanceOrderOtherFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Other - Mandate cover letterNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
04/15/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal