judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOLFI (DEBORAH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30685
Short Caption:DOLFI (DEBORAH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C131273Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/03/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/03/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
07/08/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/28/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/14/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order file the required document or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for Appellant. Required Document: Case Appeal Statement.
03/15/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file and serve the case appeal statement, request for transcript form or certificate of no transcript, the opening brief and appendix, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed on Appellant's counsel or should Appellant no longer wish to pursue this appeal, file the appropriate motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal.
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 15, 2000, we filed an order directing appellant within twenty days to file the case appeal statement, transcript request form or certificate of no transcript, and the opening brief and appendix or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against appellant's counsel. To date, appellant has failed to comply with this court's notice of July 8, 1997, its order of August 14, 1997, and its order of March 15, 2000, or to otherwise communicate with this court. We impose sanctions upon appellant's counsel. Attorney Arnold Weinstock shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, personally pay the sum of $250 to the Supreme Court Law Library and file proof of such payment with this court. Further, attorney Weinstock shall, within 20 days of the date of this order file the requested documents or show cause why additional sanctions should not be imposed. Should appellant no longer wish to proceed with this appeal, counsel shall file a motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal pursuant to NRAP 42(b) within the same 20 days. Failure to comply with this order may result in additional sanctions, including, but not limited to, referral of this matter to the State Bar of Nevada for investigation. 00-13512
04/09/2001Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. To date, attorney Weinstock has not complied with this court's orders of August 14, 1997, March 15, 2000, and August 4, 2000, or otherwise communicated with this court. Indeed, attorney Weinstock has failed to take any action to prosecute this appeal for over three years. We note further, that on October 23, 2000, this court entered an order suspending attorney Weinstock from the practice of law for a period of twelve months. Accordingly, cause appearing, we hereby remove attorney Weinstock as counsel for appellant and remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of securing new counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall appoint counsel for appellant within 30 days from the date of this order. If appellant is not indigent, the district court shall order appellant to retain counsel and to cause counsel to enter an appearance in the district court within 30 days from the district court's determination. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order on counsel. Within 15 days from appointment or appearance of counsel in the district court, counsel shall file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. 01-06026
04/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: David M. Schieck. 01-06746
05/10/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy Notice of Appointment of Counsel filed in the district court on May 5, 2001 and Order Appointing Counsel filed in district court on April 18, 2001. 01-07825
07/10/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. On April 20, 2001, attorney David M. Schieck filed a notice of appearance with this court. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). On August 4, 2000, we entered an order that sanctioned Mr. Weinstock for his conduct in this appeal. To date, Mr. Weinstock has not paid the sanction imposed against him. In light of Mr. Weinstock's temporary suspension from the practice of law and his removal from this appeal, we vacate our August 4, 2000, order directing Mr. Weinstock to pay a two hundred fifty dollar sanction and to file proof that such sanction has been paid. 01-11641
07/19/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/10/97; 4/11/97; 4/14/97; and 4/15/97. To Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin; Renee Salvaggio; and Joann Orduna. 01-12283
08/20/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 14, 1997 and April 15, 1997. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 01-14058
11/05/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief and appendix due: December 5, 2001. 01-18449
11/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, Ms. Valentin and Ms. Orduna have failed to file the transcripts requested of them. Accordingly, they shall have 20 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts requested of them. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcripts, Ms. Valentin and Ms. Orduna shall, within the same time period, file a motion with this court requesting an extension of time stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcripts cannot be produced, Ms. Valentin and Ms. Orduna shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 01-19325
11/21/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 10, 1997. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 01-19591
11/28/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Court Reporter JoAnn Orduna regarding order filed on November 11, 2001. 01-19935
12/03/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 11, 1997. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 01-20183
12/07/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-20605
12/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 7, 2001. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by January 14, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-21371
01/14/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/10/02. 02-00933
01/14/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 02-00934
02/14/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Signed by: Lynn M Robinson. 02-02922
03/18/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 03/13/02. Signed by: David M. Schieck. 02-04813
03/25/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-05214
03/25/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-09812
07/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-10404
07/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 5, 2002. 02-10404