judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TAMIKO WAGES V. ERIS SECURITY

Case Information: 10-AA-1532
Short Caption:TAMIKO WAGES V. ERIS SECURITYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02348-10Filed Date:12/10/2010

Opening Event Date:12/10/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/27/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerTamiko WagesYPro SeN
RespondentEris SecurityN
Alison N. DavisYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/10/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
12/10/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/22/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to December 10, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
12/22/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
01/14/2011APPEARANCE - of Alison N. Davis counsel for the respondent
03/17/2011RECORD ON APPEAL W/ hearing of 11/2/10
03/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/21/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
05/10/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
05/10/2011RECEIVED- petitioner's brief including appendix.
05/27/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of respondent shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
05/27/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
05/27/2011APPENDIX
06/27/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
06/27/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/21/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From (Petitioner)
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/12/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Easterly, McLeese, Steadman
09/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Easterly and McLeese, Associate Judges and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
10/18/2012FiledMandate