judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MYERS (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30643
Short Caption:MYERS (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR961058Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/28/1997How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
06/26/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/18/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court].
07/28/1997Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (copy)
07/28/1997Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/13/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal.
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Within 10 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit a certified copy of appellant's presentence investigation report, in a sealed envelope, to the clerk of this court as a supplemental record on appeal.
07/13/1999Other Other. Filed Certified Copy of Presentence Investigation Report-SEALED. (Inserted inside front cover of record on appeal.)
02/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we conclude that the district court properly dismissed appellant's petition. Briefing and oral argument are not warranted in this case. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03275
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03382
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/28/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 21, 2001. 01-03382