judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANTOS JARAMILLO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0010)
Case Number:S-11-0010Case Docketed On:01/12/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:SANTOS JARAMILLO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SANTOS JARAMILLO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSantos JaramilloElisabeth M.W. Trefonas
AppelleeThe State of WyomingD. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/18/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Order Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma PauperisRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
02/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
02/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance filed by Gregory J. Blenkinsop and Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
02/24/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina Olson.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to WithdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
02/25/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/28/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, requested signed copy of Motion for Extension of Time.EventPhone CallFinal
02/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/28/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Original copy of Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/06/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/23/2011Motion - Remand to district court with attached affidavits and other district court documents.MotionRemand to district courtFinal
05/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for partial remand for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/21/2011Order - Remand - CaleneOrderRemand - CaleneFinal
09/26/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk re status, hearing set for 11/03/2011.EventPhone CallFinal
09/28/2011System - Status check - remand. Spoke with Judge Waldrip who indicated that counsel needed additional time.SystemStatus check - remandFinal
10/17/2011Event - Phone Call to Robert Stepans requesting entry be efiled and to send six copies.EventPhone CallFinal
10/26/2011Event - Phone Call to Robert Stepans re Entry of Appearance. Assistant said that he is not going to particpate. Advised her of efile requirement.EventPhone CallFinal
11/14/2011Event - Phone Call re status of remand, new hearing has been set for 12/15/2011EventPhone CallFinal
12/27/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk re status of remand. December hearing date postponed, reset for January 26, 2012. Judge Waldrip has assigned hearing to Judge Donnell (order entered December 6, 2011)EventPhone CallFinal
12/27/2011System - Status check - other. Sent email to Justices regarding status of case.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
02/07/2012Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Notice of Completion of Findings of Fact. Called Carbon County District Court and request copy be sent to this Court.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
02/17/2012Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law and order concluding remandRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesFindings of fact and conclusions of lawFinal
02/17/2012Notice-Outgoing - Resuming briefing scheduleNotice-OutgoingResuming briefing scheduleFinal
03/28/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
03/30/2012Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/30/2012Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/30/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal