judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BETSY V. DEAS V. VERIZON WASHINGTON DC INCORPORATED

Case Information: 10-AA-1527
Short Caption:BETSY V. DEAS V. VERIZON WASHINGTON DC INCORPORATEDClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02420-10Filed Date:12/09/2010

Opening Event Date:12/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/27/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/15/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/09/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBetsy V. Deas YPro SeN
RespondentVerizon Washington DC IncorporatedNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/09/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
12/09/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/17/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
12/17/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to December 9, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW) FURTHER ORDERED that Verizon Washington DC shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
01/21/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 17, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent hasfailed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
01/26/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (11/9/10)
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/01/2011APPENDIX (no brief) (per courtsey call with appellant treat as appendix)
03/04/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 10 extra days (unopposed)
03/09/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 24, 2011. (JAC)
03/24/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's Brief (returned to petitioner by mail - brief unsigned and not served on the respondent)
03/28/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's Motion w/Brief attached (motion form incomplete and not submitted with copies - returned to Petitioner by mail)
04/05/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
05/27/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 21, 2011, which directed respondent to identify its counsel, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, and it further appearing that respondent's brief was due to be filed on or before May 2, 2011, and the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that this petition for review shall be scheduled for consideration on the record and on the petitioner's brief alone. (ETW)
05/27/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/15/2011FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker
02/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
03/09/2012FiledMandate