judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

POPE (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30077
Short Caption:POPE (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR950269Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/02/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/06/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/06/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
03/07/1997Other Other. Received Certified Copy of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 3/3/97.
03/14/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Discovery Reporting.
03/21/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
04/21/1997MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
04/24/1997Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Motion filed April 21,1997, is denied as moot. The opening brief is due July 7, 1997.
07/14/1997MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time.
07/16/1997Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Motion filed July 14,1997. The opening brief shall be served and filed on or before August 6, 1997.
08/07/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on 8/5/97.)
08/07/1997AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
09/05/1997BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (mailed on 9/4/97)
06/02/1998Other Other. Case submitted on briefs this day.
06/02/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/26/2000MotionFiled Motion. To be relieved as Counsel of Record.
02/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On January 26, 2000, Appellant's counsel filed a motion to be relieved as counsel of record in this appeal. We grant the motion. District court clerk shall file order of appointment in this court, serve counsel with this order, and submit proof of service to this court, OR file order of non-indigency in this court within 30 days; counsel shall enter appearance 10 days from the date the order is filed. Within 15 days from the date on which counsel is required, under this order, to enter an appearance in this court, counsel shall file a motion requesting permission to file a supplemental brief.
02/29/2000Other Other. Filed certified copy of district court Order appointing Counsel on Appeal. Mary Kandaras Petty appointed to represent appellant.
03/17/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Mary Kandaras Petty.
03/17/2000MotionFiled Motion. Requesting permission to file a Supplemental Brief.
03/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Attorney Petty shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a suppliemental brief on Appellant's behalf. The State shall have 30 days to file a supplemental answering brief. Upon the completion of supplemental briefing this matter shall stand submtted for decision without oral argument unless this court otherwise orders.
05/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Counsel on behalf of Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the supplemental brief or show cause why this appeal should not be submitted for decision on the briefs previously filed in this matter.
05/26/2000MotionFiled Motion. For Continuance and Affidavit in Support thereof.
06/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for Appellant has moved for an extension of time to file a supplemental brief in this appeal. fn1[Petty's motion refers to this appeal as a "fast track" appeal. This appeal is not subject to the fast track provisions of NRAP 3(c).] Petty shall have to and including June 23, 2000, to file the supplemental brief. The state shall have 20 days thereafter to file a supplemental answer. No further extensions will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.
06/16/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Request for appointment of new counsel. (Original only).
06/21/2000Other Other. Filed Request for Submission on the Briefs.
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14260
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14465
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2000. 00-14465