judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FANNIN BANK, ET AL., THOMAS W. MOORE, JR. v. C. E. JOHNSON

Case: B-1228
B-1228
11/21/1968
Application for Writ of Error
FANNIN BANK, ET AL., THOMAS W. MOORE, JR.
C. E. JOHNSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/05/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/23/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/05/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
11/21/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/05/1969Reply to Response
02/03/1969Response to Motion filed
01/23/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/05/1968Response to Petition
11/21/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/21/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thomas W. Moore, Jr.Petitioner
Fannin Bank, et al.Petitioner
C. E. JohnsonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information