Case: 07-89-00327-CV
07-89-00327-CV
10/09/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Barclay, George Ray
Opitz, David Robert
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/15/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/30/1990 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
08/30/1990 | Submission | | |
08/30/1990 | Submitted | | |
08/14/1990 | Submission | | |
11/29/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
11/29/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/08/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
10/09/1989 | Do not use | | |
10/09/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/15/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
320th District Court
Potter
Honorable Don R. Emerson
72,704-D