judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE v. QWEST CORPORATION

Case Heading (S-11-0002)
Case Number:S-11-0002Case Docketed On:01/03/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE v. QWEST CORPORATION
Full Title:WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. QWEST CORPORATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of RevenueMichael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg
Cathleen D. Parker
Gregory A. Phillips
AppelleeQwest CorporationMichael B. Rosenthal
Roy A. Adkins
Larry H. McMillin
Lucas Evan Buckley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Taxation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 146
Citation:263 P.3d 622 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/03/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/15/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Department of Revenue's motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/16/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/23/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant,Wyoming Department of RevenueEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/03/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee, Qwest Corporation's motion for admission pro hac vice; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Order granting admission of attorney pro hac vice - Roy A. AdkinsOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
05/05/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee, Qwest Corporation's motion for admission pro hac vice; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/06/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Larry H. McMillan for appellee.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
05/10/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/10/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Qwest CorporationEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Martin L. Hardsocg for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/31/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellant Wyoming Department of RevenueEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Larry H. McMillin for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/15/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes 1-2, Original Papers; Volume 3, Agency Record (16 volumes).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Martin L. Hardsocg, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellant, argument by Mr. Hardsocg; Roy A. Adkins, Lucas Evan Buckley, Larry H. McMillin, Michael B. Rosenthal, argument by Mr. McMillin for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part and remanding. Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/08/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/08/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/14/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2) - Record signed for 11/09/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal