judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES FREDERICK MOORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1521
Short Caption:JAMES FREDERICK MOORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-25039-08Filed Date:12/06/2010

Opening Event Date:12/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/15/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames F. Moore Y
James W. KleinNY
Fleming TerrellNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/13/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (45 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 8/19/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (274 pgs/Ronan) 8/23-25/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (13 pgs/tape) 11/5/10 proc. w/cd
02/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/02/2011RECORD COPIES
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (notice of surpervisiory action report--filed 4/30/09)
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (6 pgs/tape) 8/19/10 proc.
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (61 pgs/Ronan) 8/23/10 proc. w/cd
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days
04/20/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 5, 2011. (Castillo)
07/05/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before October 3, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (pii)
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 1/3/12.
12/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/10/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/23/12.
01/10/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver (Appellant)Granted
01/13/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to dismiss the appeal
01/13/2012FiledDismissed
03/15/2012FiledMandate