Case Information: 33514 | |||
Short Caption: | LEVEN VS. MCHAFFIE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A256425 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/24/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/24/1998 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 98-00510 | |
04/28/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. This matter was docketed with this court on December 24, 1998, when respondents filed a motion to dismiss. fn1[The notice of appeal was filed in the district court prior to September 1, 1996. Former Rule 13 ( c) of the Nevada Rules of appellate Procedure permitted the respondent to docket an appeal with this court for the prupose of filing a motion to dismiss]. We grant respondents' motion and hereby " . . . dismiss this appeal." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML | 99-03371 | |
05/25/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-04311 | |
05/25/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/19/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 1999. | 99-04311 |