judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BOBBY JACK JENKINS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0003)
Case Number:S-11-0003Case Docketed On:01/03/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:BOBBY JACK JENKINS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BOBBY JACK JENKINS, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerBobby Jack JenkinsTina N. Olson
Diane M. Lozano
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Jessica Y. Frint
Gregg Bonazinga

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct
Opinion Number:2011 WY 141
Citation:262 P.3d 552

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/03/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/03/2011Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
01/03/2011Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
01/19/2011Order - Petition for review - grant. Counsel to notify Court regarding status of transcripts.OrderPetition for review - grantFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Status report - other - Notice from Tina Olson that the transcripts were previously prepared and the briefing schedule may be issued.Notice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter setting briefing scheduleNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/09/2011Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
03/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of petitioner; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
04/21/2011Brief - Appellee (Respondent)BriefAppelleeFinal
04/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Respondent, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina N. Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gregg Bonazinga, Student Intern, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/20/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Briefs.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/14/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/14/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson for appellant; D. Michael Pauling and Gregg Bonazinga, argument by Mr. Bonazinga for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/12/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/01/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/31/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal