judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1103
96-1103
11/12/1996
See former TRAP 130(D)
MIGUEL RANGEL DIAZ
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/02/1997Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/23/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
04/14/1997Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedmo/re due on or before May 1, 1997.
04/14/1997MOTION FOR REHEARING DUE TO BE FILEDRehearing due 1 May, 1997
04/09/1997Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing
04/09/1997Notice requesting filing fee$10 Motion fee from Atty David Martinez
03/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDismissed for Want of JurisdictionWOJ
01/22/1997Case forwarded to Court
01/02/1997Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/14/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDdue 12-16-96
11/14/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 12-16-96
11/12/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/23/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F2 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DIAZ, MIGUEL RANGELPetitionerMr. David Martinez
STATE OF TEXASRespondentMr. Terry McEachern
Honorable Robert W. Kinkaid Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
07-95-00293-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 07-31-96
7th Court of Appeals
Honorable CARLTON DODSON
Trial Court Information
242nd District Court
Hale
Honorable Marvin F. Marshall
B27,347-9403