judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-32,543-01
WR-32,543-01
11/12/1996
1107-HC
NZUBA, AUGUSTINE N.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/13/1997ACTION TAKENHC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear
06/12/1997MISC DOCU RECD
06/05/1997SUPP RECD
03/28/1997MISC DOCU RECD
03/24/1997MISC DOCU RECD
02/12/1997ORDER ISSUEDHC Remanded to trial court for evidentiary hearing
11/12/1996WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/13/1997STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nzuba, Augustine N.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 4
Tarrant
C-4-3008-0475133-A