judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: WR-6,919-04
WR-6,919-04
11/12/1996
1107-HC
DOSS, DONALD RAY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/08/1997ACTION TAKENHC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear
10/08/1997ACTION TAKENHC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear
08/20/1997MISC DOCU RECD
08/05/1997MISC DOCU RECD
03/24/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
11/12/1996HC WRIT RECEIVED
11/12/1996WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/08/1997STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Doss, Donald RayApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
337th District Court
Harris
9420694-A