judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01380-CR
14-96-01380-CR
11/12/1996
Other Felony
Collins, Nathaniel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/1997Case stored
05/22/1997Mandate due to be issued
05/22/1997Mandate Issued
05/22/1997Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
05/22/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/22/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/22/1997Mandate Issued
05/21/1997Submission
05/21/1997Submitted
05/19/1997Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
05/08/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/08/1997Case ready to be set
05/08/1997State's brief DUE
05/08/1997Case ready to be set
04/10/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/10/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/08/1997Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
04/08/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/04/1997Past due brief
03/03/1997Appellant's brief DUE
01/31/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/31/1997Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/09/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/17/1996Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/17/1996Record due
12/17/1996Statement of Facts Due
12/17/1996Transcript FILED
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/06/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
10/18/1996Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/2017Case StoredCase archived
05/22/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasKimberly Aperauch Stelter
COLLINS, NATHANIELCriminal - AppellantJohn R. Donahue
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
630,031
10 Years TDCJ