judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MULATU WOLDE V. RITE AID OF WASHINGTON D.C.

Case Information: 10-AA-1491
Short Caption:MULATU WOLDE V. RITE AID OF WASHINGTON D.C.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02405-10Filed Date:12/02/2010

Opening Event Date:12/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/10/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerMulatu Wolde YPro SeN
RespondentRite Aid of Washington District of ColumbiaN
Thomas B. MartinNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/02/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
12/02/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/16/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to December 2, 2010. F/ORDERED that the OAH shall file the record on appeal within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. (ETW)
12/16/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
01/26/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (11/8/10 proc.)
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/01/2011LETTER - from respondent's counsel stating that respondent will not be submitting a brief in this appeal case
04/01/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 17, 2011, directing petitioner to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of petitioner and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
05/20/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
05/20/2011DISMISSED
06/10/2011MANDATE ISSUED