judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARCIA-HERNANDEZ (ALEJANDRO) VS. WASHOE COUNTY

Case Information: 33484
Short Caption:GARCIA-HERNANDEZ (ALEJANDRO) VS. WASHOE COUNTYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9705667Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/25/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00411
01/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-00161
01/25/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Mailed on: 1/21/99. 99-00469
01/25/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: ". . .we ORDER this appeal dismissed."NNP99A-CY/MS/ML. 99-06123
08/03/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 99-07114
08/03/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/11/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 1999. 99-07114