judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALAN ARTHUR SANDOVAL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0023)
Case Number:S-09-0023Case Docketed On:01/29/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ALAN ARTHUR SANDOVAL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ALAN ARTHUR SANDOVAL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlan Arthur SandovalDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 121
Citation:217 P.3d 393 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/29/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/06/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/19/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/22/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
07/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
07/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/22/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/22/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/28/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/26/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal