judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KRISTEN MINOR V. RILEY & SONS

Case Information: 10-AA-1486
Short Caption:KRISTEN MINOR V. RILEY & SONSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02124-10Filed Date:12/01/2010

Opening Event Date:12/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/29/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerKristen Minor YPro SeN
RespondentRiley & SonsNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/01/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
12/01/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/22/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to December 1, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW)
12/22/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
06/27/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript
06/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
08/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
09/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) 9/29/11
09/28/2011LodgedReceived - aplt's brief w/appdx (returned for signature & cert of serv) (Petitioner)
10/11/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
10/11/2011FiledAppendix (attached to Petitioner's Brief) (Petitioner)
11/29/2011FiledMotion to submitt on pet's brief only (titled as: motion to deny a response) (Petitioner)Granted
12/28/2011FiledOrder directing motion & brief (Respondent)
01/18/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Respondent)Granted
01/27/2012FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Respondent) & directing respondent to identify counsel and file brief
03/29/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte - scheduling before merits
03/29/2012FiledBriefing Completed
04/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Other
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/14/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges King, Easterly, Beckwith
06/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Beckwith and Easterly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
07/13/2012FiledMandate