judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUFF VS. FOSTER

Case Information: 33483
Short Caption:DUFF VS. FOSTERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34312 , 34536 , 34704 , 34717 , 55397 , 58467
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - D881238Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/17/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00410
12/17/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
01/05/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. From proper person appellant Duff re: in forma pauperis status. 99-00042
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 99-00043
01/08/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1 [We note that appellant filed an amended notice of appeal on January 5, 1999. Our conclusion today is not affected by the filing of this subsequent notice of appeal.]. 99-00127
01/21/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Defendant) filed in district court on 1/8/99. (No action required.) 99-00413
02/03/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-00733
02/03/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/10/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 1999. 99-00733