judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1111
96-1111
11/12/1996
See former TRAP 130(D)
OSBORNE OIL COMPANY
AIO JOINT VENTURE and AZTEC-CHITTIM JOINT VENTURE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/31/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
12/11/1996Reply BriefPetitionerpetitioner's response to respondent's motion to dismiss petitioner's application for writ of error (Orig. + 1 Fwd.
12/02/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/21/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
03/21/1997Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.dismissed as moot
03/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
02/03/1997Description of document returned to Supreme Courtaddress updated for Mr. Michael G. O'Neill; resent notice of 12/31/96.
01/06/1997Letter Receivedfrom Mr. H. Wayne Meachum noting that he filed a reply on 12/2/96 and does not plan to file another reply.
01/02/1997Case forwarded to Court
12/31/1996appendix to application
12/31/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/11/1996Reply Briefpetitioner's response to respondent's motion to dismiss petitioner's application for writ of error (Orig. + 1 Fwd.
12/04/1996Motion to dismiss application for writ of errorResp's Motion to Dismiss Pet's App Writ Error
12/04/1996Notice requesting filing feefrom Atty W. Meachum, $10 fee for Motion to Dismiss
12/02/1996Notice requesting filing fee$5 Reply Fee from Atty H. Wayne Meachum
12/02/1996Reply to Response
11/18/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDdue 11-08-96
11/18/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 11-08-96
11/12/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/21/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F3 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
OSBORNE OIL COMPANYPetitionerMs. Julie Hathorn Albright
Mr. William J. Albright
AIO JOINT VENTURERespondentMr. Robert M. Greenberg
Mr. H. Wayne Meachum
Mr. Michael G. O'Neill
Mr. Wade L. McClure
AZTEC-CHITTIM JOINT VENTURERespondentMr. H. Wayne Meachum
Court of Appeals Information:
05-93-00820-CV
Reversed & Remanded
RULE 90, 08-23-96
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable CAROLYN WRIGHT
Trial Court Information
298th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Adolph Canales
92-07239-G