judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01381-CR
14-96-01381-CR
11/12/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Emory, Gregory Lynn
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/04/2000Case stored
02/01/2000Case stored
01/20/2000Mandate Issued
01/20/2000Mandate Issued
01/13/2000Mandate due to be issued
01/13/2000Record RETURNED from Higher Court
12/15/1999Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/08/1999Record Sent
09/07/1999Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/06/1999Petition for discretionary review due
08/20/1999Motion for rehearing DUE
08/20/1999No motion for rehearing FILED
08/05/1999Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/05/1999Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/07/1999Submitted
01/07/1999Submission
01/07/1999Submitted
12/02/1998Submission
12/08/1997Reply brief DUE
11/17/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/17/1997Case ready to be set
11/17/1997State's brief DUE
11/17/1997Case ready to be set
10/17/1997Appellant's brief DUE
10/17/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/11/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/05/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/02/1997Appellant's brief DUE
07/17/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/14/1997Appellant's brief DUE
07/14/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/23/1997No description available.
06/05/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/26/1997Appellant's brief DUE
05/23/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/24/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/24/1997Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
04/18/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
04/18/1997Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
04/17/1997No description available.
04/15/1997Statement of Facts Due
03/20/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
03/17/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
03/14/1997No description available.
03/10/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/23/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/16/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/10/1997No description available.
01/06/1997Record due
01/06/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/03/1997Transcript FILED
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/11/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
11/07/1996Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/20/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasKimberly Aperauch Stelter
EMORY, GREGORY LYNNCriminal - AppellantTony Aninao
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable H. LON HARPER
721,082
Life TDCJ