judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01376-CR
14-96-01376-CR
11/12/1996
Other Drug Possession
Norris, Anthony
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/1999Case stored
09/22/1999Mandate Issued
09/22/1999Mandate Issued
09/14/1999Mandate due to be issued
09/14/1999Record RETURNED from Higher Court
08/18/1999Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
06/15/1999Record Sent
06/02/1999Mandate due to be issued
05/10/1999No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
05/10/1999Petition for discretionary review due
05/10/1999Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/23/1999Motion for rehearing DUE
04/23/1999No motion for rehearing FILED
04/08/1999Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/08/1999Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/05/1999Submitted
04/05/1999Submission
04/05/1999Submitted
08/29/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/29/1997Case ready to be set
08/29/1997State's brief DUE
08/29/1997Case ready to be set
08/07/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/04/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/31/1997State's brief DUE
07/03/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/03/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/30/1997Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
06/30/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/24/1997Past due brief
06/23/1997Appellant's brief DUE
06/05/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/02/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/28/1997Past due brief
05/23/1997Appellant's brief DUE
04/24/1997Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/16/1997Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/09/1997Past due brief
04/07/1997Appellant's brief DUE
03/07/1997Statement of Facts Due
03/07/1997Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/23/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/17/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/10/1997No description available.
01/06/1997Record due
01/06/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/06/1997Transcript FILED
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/07/1996Date of Sentence
11/07/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/2017Case StoredCase archived
09/22/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasKevin Patrick Yeary
NORRIS, ANTHONYCriminal - AppellantWayne Heller
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
711,069
14 Years TDCJ