judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1112
96-1112
11/12/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
INDUSTRIAL TESTING LABORATORIES INC. and ALLAN M. SIEGEL
THE HONORABLE DAVID PEEPLES JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/15/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/02/1996Reply BriefRelatorRel's Response to Reply Brief of Real Parties in Interest
11/26/1996Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondentfiled by Law Offices of David McQuade Leibowitz
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/15/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/11/1997Case Stored
06/12/1997M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
12/02/1996Reply BriefRel's Response to Reply Brief of Real Parties in Interest
11/26/1996Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamusfiled by Law Offices of David McQuade Leibowitz
11/20/1996Request made for reply to proceedingReply to be filed by 5:00 p.m., 11/26/96.
11/12/1996Exhibits receivedOrig and 2 Copies Of "Relators' Record & Exhibits"
11/12/1996Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
11/12/1996Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/11/1997Case StoredCase stored.27B4
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SIEGEL, ALLAN M.RelatorMr. Anthony E. Rebollo
REAL PARTIES IN INTERESTRespondentMr. Jeffrey Dean Powless
Mr. David McQuade Leibowitz
INDUSTRIAL TESTING LABORATORIERelatorMr. Charles J. Muller III
Mr. Farley P. Katz
Court of Appeals Information:
04-96-00844-CV
Denied
ORDER, 10-30-96
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
224th District Court
Bexar
Honorable David Peeples
95-CI-12386