judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1107
96-1107
11/12/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA PRUCO LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS PRUDENTIAL HEALTH CARE PLAN INC. and ALLAN J. CHERNOV M.D.
THE HONORABLE JERRY A. SANDEL JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/12/1996Brief in Support of PetitionRelatorIncorporated into Petition
11/12/1996Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondenton behalf of Rita & Steven McCorquodale, University of Texas M.D. Anderson Can cer Center
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/07/1997Case Stored
11/14/1996Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Overruled
11/14/1996Motion for temporary relief disposedOverruled
11/14/1996Motion to Expedite disposedOverruled
11/14/1996Motion to Stay DisposedOverruled
11/14/1996M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
11/12/1996Miscellaneous MotionPetition for Writ of Mand & Brief in Support & Request for Emerg. Relief & Sta y of Proceedings (Motion for Emergency Relief)
11/12/1996Motion to Expedite FiledIncorporated into M/L/F: M/L/F to File Pet Writ Mand & Request for Emergency Consideration & For Stay
11/12/1996Motion to Expedite FiledPetition for Writ of Mand & Brief in Support & Request for Emerg. Relief & Sta y of Proceedings
11/12/1996Motion to Stay Filed Incorporated into M/L/F Pet Writ Mand
11/12/1996Brief in Support of PetitionIncorporated into Petition
11/12/1996Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
11/12/1996Notice requesting filing fee$40.00 Filing Fee for Motions from Atty Youngblood
11/12/1996Petition for writ received
11/12/1996Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamuson behalf of Rita & Steven McCorquodale, University of Texas M.D. Anderson Can cer Center
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/06/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPARelatorMs. Donna Emily White Johns
Ms. Katherine S. Youngblood
PRUDENTIAL HEALTH CARE PLAN, IRelatorMs. Teresa I. Ford
MCCORQUODALE, RITARespondentMr. Roger Knight Jr.
THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS M.D.Other interested party Mr. Robert B. Christian
Mr. Dan Fontaine
CHERNOV, ALLENRelatorMr. Augustus T. White
PRUCO LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYRelatorMs. Donna Emily White Johns
MCCORQUODALE, STEVENRespondentMr. Roger Knight Jr.
Ms. Cheri Duncan
Court of Appeals Information:
10-96-00240-CV
Denied
RULE 90, 11-04-96
10th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Madison
Honorable Jerry A. Sandel
95-7857-278-6