judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1110
96-1110
11/12/1996
Habeas set to argue
EX PARTE: JAMES CRAIG GUETERSLOH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/18/1996Reply BriefRespondentexhibits filed also on behalf of Rolling Fork Owners Committee, Inc
11/12/1996Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
11/12/1996Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/04/1997Case Stored935 SW2d 110
12/13/1996Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordjudgment issued
12/13/1996Opinion issuedmotion granted in partThe petition for writ of habeas corpus is granted in part. TRAP 122. 935 SW2d 110
12/13/1996Petition for writ of habeas corpus disposed.Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition granted per R.122.Pursuant to TRAP 122, the petition for writ of habeas corpus is granted in part. Per Curiam opinion.
11/25/1996Reply to Response to Motionresponse to relator's motion to give priority to petition for writ of Habeas C orpus
11/21/1996Motion to Expedite FiledMotion to Give Priority to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
11/18/1996Reply Briefexhibits filed also on behalf of Rolling Fork Owners Committee, Inc
11/13/1996Request made for reply to proceedingby Monday, November 18, 1996 by 5:00 pm
11/12/1996Brief in Support of Petition
11/12/1996Certificate of Custody filedFaxed copy (1), from the Sheriff's Office
11/12/1996Commitment order issued in original proceedingIncorporated with the Judgment of Contempt and Order to Issue Capias
11/12/1996Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordTrial Court's Judgment
11/12/1996Judgment of contemptJudgment of Contempt from the 14th COA
11/12/1996Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.Opinion of the 14th COA
11/12/1996Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
11/12/1996Statement of facts filed in habeas corpus"Contempt Hearing"
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/04/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F3 No Rehearing Filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thomas, Sheriff, TommyOther interested party Tommy Thomas Sheriff
ROLLING FORK OWNERS COMMITTEERespondentMs. Margaret Susan Rice
Ms. Sandra Kay Williams
GUETERSLOH, JAMES CRAIGRelatorHonorable Harold Phelan
Court of Appeals Information:
14-95-01272-CV
Affirmed as Modified
RULE 90, 10-10-96
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable J. HARVEY HUDSON
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
Honorable Scott A. Brister
93-62022