judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1106
96-1106
11/12/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
R.W. WILSON INTERNATIONAL INC.
THE HONORABLE LYNN BRADSHAW-HULL JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/16/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/15/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/16/1996Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondent with accompanying in-camera envelope
11/13/1996Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/16/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/15/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/09/1997Case Stored
04/18/1997M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledmandamus overruled
12/19/1996Addendum to brief filed"Supplement to Order Disqualifying Counsel"
12/16/1996Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus with accompanying in-camera envelope
12/16/1996Sealed document filed in case1 in-camera envelope to accompany reply of real party
12/04/1996Request made for reply to proceedingdue by 5:00 p.m., December 16, 1996
11/13/1996Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/13/1996Notice requesting filing feeexhibit ($25.00) to Tina Snelling
11/12/1996Exhibits receivedOrig + 2 of Vol's I & II
11/12/1996Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
11/12/1996Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
06/09/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F2
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CONDON, WILLIAM S.RespondentHonorable Lawrence David Weiman
Mr. John W. Belk
BRADSHAW-HULL, LYNNJudgeHonorable Lynn M. Bradshaw-Hull
WEALTH PRESERVATION, INC.RespondentHonorable Lawrence David Weiman
CONDON & CO., INC.RespondentHonorable Lawrence David Weiman
CONDON & COMPANY, INC.RespondentMs. Tina V. Snelling
R.W. WILSON INTERNATIONAL, INCRelatorMr. Martin S. Schexnayder
Mr. Todd J. Zucker
Mr. David Wayne Clawater
Mr. Leonard H. Simon
Court of Appeals Information:
01-96-01284-CV
Overruled
RULE 90, 10-29-96
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Civil Court at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable John Bradshaw
622505