judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01387-CV
14-96-01387-CV
11/12/1996
Divorce
Hines, Clarence Maurice
Hines, Lorine
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/09/1997Case stored
09/08/1997Mandate due to be issued
09/08/1997Mandate Issued
09/08/1997Mandate Issued
08/22/1997Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
03/20/1997No description available.GRANTED
03/04/1997No description available.
03/04/1997Writ of Error FILED
03/04/1997Writ of Error RECEIVED
03/03/1997Writ of error DUE
02/10/19973rd Notice of Clerk's Record Filing Fee Due
01/30/1997Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAMOOT
01/30/1997Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
01/24/1997Motion for rehearing DUE
01/09/1997Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
01/09/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
01/09/1997Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
01/09/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
01/08/19972nd Notice of Clerk's Record Filing Fee Due
01/08/1997Case ready to be set
01/08/1997Submitted
01/08/1997Submission
01/08/1997Submitted
01/08/1997Case ready to be set
01/07/1997Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
01/06/1997Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
11/12/1996Transcript received only; mtn. pending
11/12/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/18/1996Bond FILED
08/06/1996Motion for new trial FILED
07/19/1996Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/08/1997Case StoredCase stored
12/16/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HINES, LORINEAppelleeBert Creel
HINES, CLARENCE MAURICEAppellantJoseph R. Willie, II
Trial Court Information
257th District Court
Harris
Honorable LINDA MOTHERAL
92-036663