Case Information: 03-CV-0464 | |||
Short Caption: | CINNAMON BALMUTH, ET AL V. PHILLIPS COLLECTION | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Lead: | 03-CV-0464 | Consolidated: | 03-CV-0463 , 03-CV-0465 , 03-CV-0466 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LT7776-03 | Filed Date: | 04/30/2003 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/30/2003 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 10/17/2003 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Cinnamon Balmuth | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | Marylin Rich | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Phillips Collection | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
04/30/2003 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
05/09/2003 | ORDERED that the motion for stay in no. 02-CV-893 is hereby held in abeyance. F/O, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 03-CV-463, 03-CV-464, 03-CV-465 and 03-CV-466 are hereby consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that appeals nos. 02-CV-893, 03-CV-463, 03-CV-464, 03-CV-465 and 03-CV-466 and the orders which are the subject of said appeals are hereby administratively stayed pending further order of this court. (by: TESCGL) | |||
05/09/2003 | Error | |||
05/12/2003 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT for all cases | |||
05/12/2003 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE 03cv 463 | |||
05/12/2003 | DESIGNATION OF RECORD | |||
05/12/2003 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) | |||
05/12/2003 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE 03cv464 | |||
05/12/2003 | CASE STAYED | |||
05/12/2003 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE 03cv465 | |||
05/12/2003 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE 03cv466 | |||
05/12/2003 | APPELLEE'S REPLY - to aplt's oppo emergency motion for stay pending appeal | |||
05/14/2003 | PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED | |||
05/14/2003 | ORDERED that the administrative stay is hereby vacated. *** MORE *** | |||
05/20/2003 | ORDER GRANTING APLT'S MOTION FOR STAY and the above judgments for possession that are appealed in Appeal nos. 03-CV-463, 03-CV-464, 03-CV-465 and 03-CV-466 are hereby stayed on the condition ahat appellants post a bond in the Superior Court in the amount of $200,000.00 no later than 5:00 p.m. on May 20, 2003. Appellants shall submit documentation to this court that the bond has been posted. Failure to post the bond and submit the required documentation shall result in the stay being vacated. (by: FARDWS) | |||
05/21/2003 | On further consideration of this court's May 14, 2003 order that granted appellant's emergency motion for stay pending appeal upon the filing of a bond in the amount of $ 200,000.00 no later than 5pm May 20, 2003, and it appearing that the bond was not secured. It is Ordered that the stay of the writs of possession is hereby vacated. (FARDWA) | |||
08/14/2003 | COPY OF SUPERIOR COURT LETTER to atty. Eric M. Rome, dated 7/30/03 | |||
08/25/2003 | It appearing that appellants have been notified by the Clerk of the Superior Court that the records on appeal have been prepared and is ready for transmittal to this court, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, make the necessary arrangements to have the complete record on appeal transmitted to this court. Failure to comply with this order shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 11 and 14. (BY: GP) lw/sw | |||
09/25/2003 | ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 14. (By: AMW) lw | |||
09/25/2003 | DISMISSED | |||
10/17/2003 | MANDATE ISSUED |