judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERRELL (GLEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36344
Short Caption:FERRELL (GLEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159928Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/29/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-10878
06/26/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 22, 2000. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. Filed in district court on: June 21, 2000. 00-10879
06/30/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 22, 2000. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 00-11264
08/02/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-13330
08/02/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-13331
08/24/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Corrected Fast Track Response. 00-14870
08/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On August 24, 2000, respondent filed a motion to file a corrected fast track response. We grant respondent's motion. The clerk shall forthwith return, unfiled, respondent's fast track response submitted provisionally on August 22, 2000, and shall file respondent's corrected response which was submitted provisionally on August 24, 2000, along with respondent's fast track appendix submitted provisionally on August 22, 2000. 00-15356
08/31/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14871
08/31/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-14726
08/31/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Tufteland: returned unfiled, the original Fast Track Response received on August 22, 2000.
05/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[The parties need not file a new appendix and may utilize the fast track appendix filed. If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 01-08731
07/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel. Respondent shall within 30 days of service of the opening brief, file and serve the answering brief. Appellant may file a rely brief within 30 days of service of the answering brief. 01-12841
08/17/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-14004
09/18/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-15738
10/31/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
01/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-01899
01/29/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB.
10/31/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-18719
10/31/2002Other Other. Order of Affirmance corrected and re-mailed 10/31/02.
11/26/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-18953
11/26/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 3, 2002. 02-18953