judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BERNADETTE C. SMITH V. CHARLES L. SMITH

Case Information: 10-FM-1546
Short Caption:BERNADETTE C. SMITH V. CHARLES L. SMITHClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB2782-10Filed Date:12/07/2010

Opening Event Date:12/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBernadette C. Smith YPro SeN
AppelleeCharles L. Smith NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 7, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (44 pgs/tape) 11/1/10 proc. w/cd
01/13/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
01/13/2011DISMISSED
01/20/2011RECEIVED - RECORD & RINDX
02/04/2011MANDATE ISSUED