judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRASMICK (KEITH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36343
Short Caption:GRASMICK (KEITH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C54899Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/04/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10870
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36313, 36332, 36336, 36338, 36343, 36374, 36396. Document No. 00-13561.
12/04/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumnes 1 through 6. Mailed on: 11/30/00. 00-21163
12/04/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03306
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03721
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03721