judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING ROY SCHATZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY,

Case Heading (S-11-0025)
Case Number:S-11-0025Case Docketed On:01/26/2011
Linked To: S-11-0026 , S-11-0027
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING ROY SCHATZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY,
Full Title:IN RE: THE GENERAL ADJUDICATION OF ALL RIGHTS TO USE WATER IN THE BIG HORN RIVER SYSTEM AND ALL OTHER SOURCES, STATE OF WYOMING ROY SCHATZ, Appellant, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING and FARMERS CANAL COMPANY, Appellees.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoy Schatz Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Jay Arthur Jerde
Marion Jane Yoder
AppelleeFarmers Canal CompanyMichael S. Messenger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/26/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/26/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/31/2011Event - Phone Call - Received call from appellant (Phil Hartman) regarding whether or not Farmers Canal Company should be appellee. Advised we would contact counsel for the Canal regarding status and let him know.EventPhone CallFinal
01/31/2011Event - Phone Call - advised appellant that after contact with counsel for Farmers Canal Company, they will remain in the caption as appellees.EventPhone CallFinal
02/07/2011Motion - Stay Briefing Schedule and Time for Appellant Brief Based on File is Not Complete with No Final Order Filed On: Decision Approving Special Master's Report and Recommendation Regarding Farmers Canal & Order Denying Objection of Frank Mohr, Phillip Hartman and Roy Schatz signed by Court on 6 December 2010.MotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Motion for Rejection of the Revised Report filed in the District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Schatz's Motion for Court to Answer all Motions filed in the District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/01/2011Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
03/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal