judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS M. TOGGAS V. RRR, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1544
Short Caption:THOMAS M. TOGGAS V. RRR, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAF6103-09Filed Date:12/03/2010

Opening Event Date:12/03/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/01/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThomas M. Toggas NPro SeN
AppelleeRrr Inc.N
Jonathan S. JacobsNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/03/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/07/2011 ORDERED that appelant shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for having been taken from a DISCOVERY ORDER which is not an APPEALABLE ORDER...OR for LACK OF STANDING since appellant cannot appeal the denial of another party's motion to intervene. (BY: ETW)
01/07/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
01/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (27-pgs/tape 10/4/10 proc.)
01/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (53-pgs/tape 10/29/10 proc.)
01/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (13-pgs/tape 11/30/10 p roc) w/ cd
01/21/2011RECORD INDEX
01/26/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's)
02/10/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE discovery order...SEE HARDCOPY (FIBEKG) (cb)
02/10/2011DISMISSED
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - of order 2/10/11
02/23/2011TMC - motion for reconsideration
03/15/2011ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (FIBEKG) (cb)
04/01/2011MANDATE ISSUED