judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6328
B-6328
10/14/1976
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF ARLINGTON, TEXAS, ET AL.
TEXAS ELECTRONIC SERVICE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/18/1977Errata FiledPetitioner
04/06/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/31/1977Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/17/1977Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
10/29/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
10/14/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/18/1977Errata Filed
04/12/1977Response to Motion filed
04/06/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/31/1977Response to Brief filed
01/17/1977Supplemental Brief filed
10/29/1976Response to Petition
10/14/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/14/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Electronic Service CompanyRespondent
City of Arlington, Texas, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information