Case Heading (S-10-0261) | |||||
Case Number: | S-10-0261 | Case Docketed On: | 12/16/2010 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20) | ||
Short Title: | EUGENE DALE SWANEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT | ||||
Full Title: | EUGENE DALE SWANEY, Appellant (Respondent), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT, Appellee (Petitioner). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Eugene Dale Swaney | Juliana Hernandez Ricky Lynn Martinez Wendy Susan Ross |
Appellee | Department of Family Services - Child Support Enforcement Division | Robin Sessions Cooley Jill E. Kucera Gregory A. Phillips Christina Faith McCabe |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Child Support |
Opinion Number: | 2011 WY 105 |
Citation: | 256 P.3d 514 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
12/16/2010 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
12/16/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
12/16/2010 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
12/16/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
01/28/2011 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
01/28/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/16/2011 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
03/16/2011 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee, The State of Wyoming, Department of Family Services, child support enforcement and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/21/2011 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
04/04/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
04/05/2011 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
04/14/2011 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcript. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/08/2011 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
07/26/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
07/26/2011 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
07/26/2011 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
07/29/2011 | Service - Certified mail signature return card | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |