judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL F. BURKE V. JUDITH BURKE

Case Information: 10-FM-1518
Short Caption:MICHAEL F. BURKE V. JUDITH BURKEClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO2536-10Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/25/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael F. Burke YPro SeN
AppelleeJudith Burke NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 24, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
12/30/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
12/30/2010WithdrawnDISMISSED
01/21/2011WithdrawnMANDATE ISSUED
04/05/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL w/motion for appeal transcript
04/12/2011RECEIVED - SR#1 (11 pgs/tape---10/27/11) w/cd
05/09/2011RECEIVED - SR#2 (5 pgs/tape--8/9/10 proc.)
05/09/2011RECEIVED - SR#3 (147 pgs/tape---10/19/10 proc)
05/09/2011RECEIVED - SR#4 (129 pgs/tape---10/20/10 proc)
05/09/2011RECEIVED - SR#5 (11 pgs/tape...10/27/10 proc.) w/cd
05/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/12/2011MANDATE RECALLED
05/12/2011ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
05/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (dlm)
05/16/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS JOINT Granted
05/24/2011RECORD INDEX
05/24/2011RECORD COPIES
05/31/2011ORD GRT COUNSEL MO TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASON and the appearance of Nelson Garcia, Esq., is herebywithdrawn as cousnel of record. It is F/O that appellee shall advise this court within 20 days from the date of this order as to the identity of new counsel, or whether appellee intends to proceed on appeal pro se. Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellant being deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. (ETW)
06/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
07/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) & aplt's oppo to aple's motion to dismiss appeal one pleading.Granted
07/12/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion to dismiss (in same pleading as the motion for extension of time to file brief) (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledMotion to dismiss aplt's motion to extend briefing schedule file with and in the same document as aplt's motin to oppoed aple's motion to dismiss appeal (Appellee)Denied
08/08/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File brief and appendix and holding appellee's motion to dismiss in abeyance.
08/25/2011LodgedReceived - opposition to aple's motion to dismiss aplt's motion to ext briefing schd and aplt's motion to dismiss appeal. (Appellant)
09/09/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)Denied as Moot
09/19/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion to stay appeal and extend briefing schedule (Appellee)
10/03/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte, motion to stay held in abeyance, appellee's motion to dismiss denied, directing status of 23-110 motion
12/30/2011FiledMotion - to set briefing schedule (Appellant)Granted
01/17/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)
01/17/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion - to set briefing schedule (Appellant)
01/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record #6 (5-pgs/tape 8/9/10 proc.)
01/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record #7 (147-pgs/tape 10/19/10 proc.)
01/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record #8 (129-pgs/tape 10/20/10 proc.)
01/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record#9 (11-pgs/tape 10/27/10 proc.)
01/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record #10 (29-pgs/tape 4/21/11 proc.)
01/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record #11 (24-pgs/tape 5/12/11 proc.)
01/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record #12 (142-pgs/tape 6/14/11 proc.)
01/23/2012FiledSupplemental Record #13 (154-pgs/tae 6/15/11 proc.)w/cd
03/02/2012FiledOrder directing motion, brief & limited appendix
04/03/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
04/03/2012FiledDismissed
04/25/2012FiledMandate