judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEWIS VS. PENNELLE

Case Information: 33505
Short Caption:LEWIS VS. PENNELLECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A356518Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice LeavittPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/23/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from F. Kelly Cawley--check no. 7932.
12/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00488
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/05/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-00044
01/07/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00074
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/05/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Substitution of Attorneys. John Cotton in place and stead of Sherman B. Mayor as counsel for respondent Penelle. 99-02520
04/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 29, 1999. 99-03474
10/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 10/29/99. 99-09459
11/16/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Partial settlement agreement reached. 99-11346
11/17/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation and Order for Dismissal without Prejudice as to Premier Health Care, Inc. 99-11412
01/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Disapproved. We disapprove the November 17, 1999, stipulation. The parties shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file a stipulation for dismissal of Premier Health Care, Inc, with prejudice, or otherwise inform this court of the status of Premier Health Care, Inc., in this appeal. The briefing schedule for the remaining parties is stayed pending the response to this order. 00-00423
05/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Partially Dismissing Appeal. The parties having failed to respond to our order filed on January 11, 2000, we dismiss this appeal as to respondent Premier Health Care, Inc. only. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption appearing on this court's docket by removing Premier Health Care, Inc. as a respondent. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 70 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-07815
07/21/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 7/20/00. 00-12679
07/21/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Addendum to Appellant's Opening Brief. 00-12681
07/21/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-12683
07/21/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Received copy of letter from Jeffrey Whitehead that was mailed to F. Kelly Cawley regarding Premier Health Care. 00-12684
08/22/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 8/21/00. 00-14682
09/22/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 23, 2000. 00-16802
10/25/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 10/23/00. 00-18861
12/12/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. On July 21, 2000, appellant submitted an addendum to the opening brief. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, show cause why this court should not strike the addendum to the oepning brief, and disregard any references or citations to those materials that may be present in the opening or reply brief. 00-21667
12/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 00-22517
12/27/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order to Show Cause (order filed 12/12/00); Motion in the Alternative to Remand to District Court for Purposes of Supplementation of Record on Appeal. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 12/22/00. 00-22543
01/11/2001Other Other. Filed Request for Leave to File Opposition to Appellant's/Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause; Motion in the Alternative to Remand to District Court for Purposes of Supplementation of Record on Appeal Pursuant to NRS 34.260. 01-00627
01/30/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-01988
03/28/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn4[We deny as moot the request for relief contained in the document which appellant filed on December 27, 2000. We further deny as moot the request for relief contained in the document which respondents filed on January 11, 2001.] SNP01A-WM/CY/NB 01-05445
04/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-05454
04/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 5, 2001. 01-05454