judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6307
B-6307
10/06/1976
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
RICHLAND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
HON. JOHN COMPTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/18/1976Brief on the MeritsRelator
10/13/1976Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
10/13/1976Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/16/1978Letter Filed
12/01/1976Order from Lower Court filed
11/18/1976Brief on the Merits
10/21/1976Letter Filed
10/13/1976Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/13/1976Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
10/06/1976Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Richland Manufacturing CompanyRelator
Hon. John ComptonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information