judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6313
B-6313
10/08/1976
Application for Writ of Error
FRIEDA WATTS, STATE OF TEXAS, ON BEHALF OF THE PUBLIC FREE SCHOOL FUND, FRIEDA WATTS, ET AL.
MARJORIE PRICE CRAWFORD, ET AL., ALCO OIL AND GAS CORPORATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/21/1977Errata FiledPetitioner
09/19/1977Amended motion for rehearingPetitioner
08/10/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/09/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/28/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/08/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/19/1976Response to PetitionPetitioner
11/15/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
10/15/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
10/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/21/1977Errata Filed
09/19/1977Amended motion for rehearing
09/08/1977Response to Motion filed
08/10/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/09/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/25/1977Motion to amend application for writ of error
01/28/1977Reply to Response
12/08/1976Reply to Response
11/19/1976Response to Petition
11/15/1976Response to Petition
10/27/1976Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
10/15/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/08/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Marjorie Price Crawford, et al.Respondent
Frieda Watts, et al.Petitioner
State of Texas, on behalf of the Public Free School FundPetitioner
Frieda WattsPetitioner
Alco Oil and Gas Corporation, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information