judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6343
B-6343
10/26/1976
Application for Writ of Error
FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, A. F. CONNER AND SONS, INC., A. F. CONNER AND SONS, INC., ET AL.
TRI-COUNTY WATER SUPPLY CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/06/1978Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/01/1978Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/12/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/11/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/11/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/26/1977Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/02/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/18/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/13/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/13/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/12/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/24/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/22/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/05/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
10/26/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/20/1978Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
02/06/1978Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/01/1978Motion for Rehearing
01/18/1978Dissenting opinion issued.
01/18/1978Opinion issued
10/24/1977Response to Motion filed
10/12/1977Motion for Rehearing
10/11/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/11/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/26/1977Supplement to Response
05/02/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/25/1977Response to Motion filed
04/18/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/13/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/13/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/12/1977Motion for RehearingFiling granted
03/30/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/30/1977Document received (See Remarks)
02/24/1977Motion for RehearingFiling granted
02/22/1977Motion for RehearingFiling granted
11/05/1976Response to Petition
10/26/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/26/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jim D. LovettAmicus Curiae
Tri-County Water Supply CorporationRespondent
THOMAS M. PHILLIPSAmicus Curiae
Fidelity and Deposit Company of MarylandPetitioner
A. F. Conner and Sons, Inc.Petitioner
Texas Trial Lawyers AssociationAmicus Curiae
Frank MaloneyAmicus Curiae
A. F. Conner and Sons, Inc., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information