judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COPELCO CREDIT CORP. VS. LEWIS C/W 36856

Case Information: 36347
Short Caption:COPELCO CREDIT CORP. VS. LEWIS C/W 36856Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:36347*, 36856 Related Case(s): 36856
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A333833Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/06/2000 / Goldberg, AubreySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kerr & Associates--check no. 7459.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10885
07/06/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Aubrey Goldberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/08/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge states there has been no response and the settlement conference will now be reset notwithstanding the fact that there has been no ruling by the Second Judicial District Court on the appellant's motion. 01-04270
07/13/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-11908
07/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
07/31/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12905
08/06/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. We hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these matters. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of these appeals. Copelco Credit Corporation and Nathan Lewis shall each have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant Copelco Credit Corporation: 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 36347. Nathan Lewis shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve and answering brief in Docket No. 36347 and an opening brief in Docket No. 36856. Copelco Credit Corporation shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve a reply brief in Docket No. 36347 and an answering brief in Docket No. 36856. Nathan Lewis shall have 30 days thereafter to file and serve a reply brief in Docket No. 36856. Nos. 36347/36856. (01-13228) 01-13228
08/20/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 36347/36856. 01-14070
12/05/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. (36347 only) Mailed on: Fed Ex 12/04/01. Nos. 36347/36856. 01-20355
12/05/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (36347 only) "Appellant's Appendix Pursuant to NRAP 30". Nos. 36347/36856. 01-20356
12/31/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. in no. 36347. (42 days requested.) Nos. 36347/36856 01-21893
01/08/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed December 31, 2001. Mr. Lewis is reminded that, pursuant to order of this court entered on August 6, 2001, his brief shall be a combined answering brief in Docket No. 36347 and opening brief in Docket No. 36856. Mr. Lewis shall file and serve the combined answering brief and opening brief by February 14, 2002. In the event the appendix filed by Copelco Credit Corporation on December 5, 2001, does not include all documents to which Mr. Lewis will be citing, Mr. Lewis shall file an appendix with his combined brief. Briefing shall proceed with the schedule set forth in this court's order entered on August 6, 2001. Nos. 36347/36856. (02-00429) 02-00429
02/13/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time for Respondent/Appellant, Nathan Lewis, D/B/A Dental Delivery Systems to File Answering Brief and Combined Opening Brief (Second Request) Nos. 36347/36856. 02-02886
02/20/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed February 13, 2002. Mr. Lewis shall file and serve the combined answering brief in Docket No. 36347 and opening brief in Docket No. 36856, by March 7, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Nos. 36347/36856. (02-03194) 02-03194
03/08/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. (Combined Answering Brief in 36347 and Opening Brief in 36856 see order filed 01/08/02). Mailed on: 03/07/02. Signed by: Marie C. Mirch. Nos. 36347/36856. 02-04275
03/08/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. (Appendix to Combined Answering Brief in 36347 and Opening Brief in 36856-see order filed 01/08/02). Nos. 36347/36856. 02-04276
04/09/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. (36347 only). Mailed on: Fed Ex 04/08/02. Signed by: P. Sterling Kerr. Nos. 36347/36856. 02-06240
04/09/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. (36347 only). Nos. 36347/36856. 02-06241
04/16/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplement to Appendix. Nos. 36347/36856. 02-06802
09/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and these appeals shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. See NRAP 34(f)(1). Nos. 36347/36856. 02-15850
09/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB. Nos. 36347/36856.
11/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB. Nos. 36347/38656 02-20057
12/17/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-20340
12/17/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/30/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 19, 2002. 02-20340