judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRIS LABAS, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.

Case Information: 10-AA-1549
Short Caption:CHRIS LABAS, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Alcohol Beverage Control Board (ABC)
Lead: 10-AA-1245 Consolidated:10-AA-1549
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PRO00003-10Filed Date:12/17/2010

Opening Event Date:12/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerChris Labas N
Cornish F. HitchcockNY
PetitionerFlorence Harmon N
Cornish F. HitchcockNY
PetitionerMichael Macchiaroli N
Cornish F. HitchcockNY
PetitionerJulie Gess N
Cornish F. HitchcockNY
PetitionerAndrew Dinsmore N
Cornish F. HitchcockNY
PetitionerTrevor Neve N
Cornish F. HitchcockNY
RespondentD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/17/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/17/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/17/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
12/17/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE this appeal with 10-AA-1245.
12/30/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 10-AA-1245 and 10-AA-1549 are consolidated for all purposes. It is F/O that the administrative agency shall transmit the record for petition for review no. 10-AA-1549 within 20 days from the date of this order. It is F/O that the briefing order issued on December 16, 2020, shall remain in effect and the parties shall file consolidated briefs addressing both petitions for review. (ETW)
01/19/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/7/11
01/24/2011 On consideration of petitioners' motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioners' brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. (JAC)
02/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD1 (documents of the AB Regulation administration)
03/07/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
03/07/2011APPENDIX
04/06/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 4/27/11
04/12/2011 On consideration of respondent's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before April 27, 2011. (JAC)
04/27/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO REMAND no oppo
05/12/2011ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT MOTION TO REMAND and these petitions for review are hereby dismissed, and the cases are remanded to the agency for further proceedings consistent with the statements made in respondent's motion. It is F/O that the Clerk shall issue the mandates forthwith. (ETW)
05/12/2011DISMISSED
05/12/2011REMANDED
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED